Trustees THE BACH CHOIR
Charity number: 258287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATHARINE SUSAN RICHMAN MA | Chair |
|
||||||
Michael Jonathan Charles Whitehead | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Thomas O'Reilly | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leona Wyn Roberts | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexander Churchill | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julien Allen | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lily German | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chrysta Adesola Olutoyin Haastrup | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jill Pringle | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Clarke | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Naomi May Wordsworth | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Andrew James Clifford | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Stephen John Hargreaves | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr RICHARD CLIVE BLACKFORD | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr DAVID NEIL HILL MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.