Trustees SAMUEL WILLIAM FARMER TRUST
Charity number: 258459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER GAUNTLETT FOX-ANDREWS | Chair | 24 April 1984 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Kay Dewey | Trustee | 13 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES KENNETH BROCKIS | Trustee | 15 October 2004 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE JOHN WAIGHT | Trustee | 05 April 2002 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANNE LIDDIARD | Trustee | 26 October 2001 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.