Governing document CHARITIES FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF THE CITY HALL GARDENS AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCES DATED 25 MARCH 1937, 29 JULY 1937, 8 JULY 1938, 15 AUGUST 1938, 4 AUGUST 1942, 23 SEPTEMBER 1942 ALL AS AFFECTED BY SCHEME DATED 24 OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
50% OF THE INCOME TO BE APPLIED IN OR TOWARDS THE UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF THE OPEN SPACE IN BARKERS POOL IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD KNOWN AS CITY HALL GARDEN AND SUBJECT THERETO IN OR TOWARDS THE UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PARK OR RECREATION GROUND HELD UPON TRUST BY SHEFFIELD CITY COUNCIL, AS TRUSTEE OF THE CHARITY, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD; THE REMAINING 50% WILL BE TRANSFERRED TO THE TRUSTEES OF AND APPLIED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY CALLED THE SPIRIT OF SHEFFIELD CHILDREN'S TRUST (1089755)
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.