Register of Charities - The Charity Commission ADRIAN GRAVES MEMORIAL EXHIBITION
Charity number: 311268-31
Removed charity
Governing document
WILLS PROVED 8 JANUARY 1937 AND 17 AUGUST 1944 AND DEED DATED 20 NOVEMBER 1953 AS AMENDED ON 21 NOVEMBER 2005 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
AN EXHIBITION TENABLE AT THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 16 October 1963: Standard registration
- 06 June 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 06 June 2006: Funds transferred to 1105500 GRESHAM'S SCHOOL
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.