Trustees THE CHELTENHAM BACH CHOIR
Charity number: 261961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS Gill Douglas | Chair | 07 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Alan Winwood | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Margaret Helen Louise Salter | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Bryant | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Upton | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gummer | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Fagan | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Rooke | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr SHIRLEY ELLIOTT | Trustee | 29 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
EMMA REED | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.