Governing document BEDFORDSHIRE ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 262813
Charity reporting is up to date (83 days late)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH JUNE 1971 AND AMENDED 9TH SEPTEMBER 1987, AND 29TH JUNE 2004 AND 15 OCTOBER 2008 as amended on 20 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MUSICAL EDUCATION IN BEDFORDSHIRE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BEDFORDSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.