Trustees THE WISBECH SOCIETY AND PRESERVATION TRUST LTD
Charity number: 263115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAYMOND ALFRED JOHNSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||
Daljit Roy | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Robert Allen Hodgson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Professor Keith John Barkclay Rix | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Lorena Jane Hodgson | Trustee | 02 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Susanah Louise Farmer | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Peter Anton Freeman | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Dr Eric Somerville | Trustee | 23 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
PAUL EDWARD EDEN | Trustee | 28 February 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
KATHLEEN MARY POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||
Richard Symond Gyles Barnwell | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||||||
ROGER POWELL | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||||||
David Edwin Crouch | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.