Governing document Rottingdean Heritage
Charity number: 264056
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST AND RULES DATED 02 MAY 1960 AS AMENDED ON 21 APRIL 1972, 16 AUGUST 1985 AND 22 NOVEMBER 2012 as amended on 16 Dec 2020 as amended on 16 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
(A) TO PRESERVE THE VILLAGE AND THE AMENITIES AND RURAL SURROUNDINGS OF ROTTINGDEAN AND IMPROVE THE SAME. (B) TO PRESERVE AND MAINTAIN THE ROTTINGDEAN WINDMILL. (C) TO PRESERVE AND MAINTAIN THE GRANGE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
ROTTINGDEAN
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.