Governing document GLOUCESTERSHIRE COUNTY SMALL-BORE RIFLE AND PISTOL ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/06/1967 AS AMENDED ON 02/07/1972 AS AMENDED ON 01/01/1998 AS AMENDED ON 06/05/2004 AS AMENDED ON 24/04/2014
Charitable objects
3.1 THE ASSOCIATION SHALL ENCOURAGE SKILL IN RIFLE AND PISTOL SHOOTING BY PROVIDING INSTRUCTION AND PRACTICE IN THE USE OF TARGET RIFLES AND PISTOLS TO ANY OF HER MAJESTY’S SUBJECTS SO THAT THEY MAY BE BETTER FITTED TO SERVE THEIR COUNTRY IN THE ARMED FORCES, TERRITORIAL ARMY OR ANY OTHER ORGANISATION IN WHICH THEIR SERVICES MAY BE REQUIRED IN TIME OF PERIL. 3.2 THE ASSOCIATION SHALL ENCOURAGE, PROMOTE AND FOSTER A HEALTHY RECREATIONAL AND COMPETITIVE INTEREST IN THE SPORT OF SMALL-BORE RIFLE AND PISTOL SHOOTING WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND WILL PERFORM THE DUTIES OF A COUNTY ASSOCIATION (FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS ASSOCIATION THE BOUNDARY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE INCLUDES SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE). 3.3 THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE A MEMBERS ASSOCIATION, CATEGORY C, AFFILIATED TO THE NATIONAL SMALL-BORE RIFLE ASSOCIATION AND ANY OTHER RIFLE OR PISTOL ASSOCIATION AS THE ASSOCIATION COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. 3.4 THE ASSOCIATION SHALL CONSIST OF MEMBER AND AFFILIATED SMALLBORE RIFLE, PISTOL AND AIRGUN CLUBS IN OR AROUND THE COUNTY BOUNDARY AS CONSIDERED APPROPRIATE BY THE ASSOCIATION COMMITTEE.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.