Governing document FRANK HANSCOMB DINGLE FOR PENSIONS AND AGED POOR
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF 3 OCTOBER 1972 , 4 JANUARY 1979, 18 NOVEMBER 1980 AND 12 JULY 1988 AS AMENDED ON 21 OCT 2020 AS AMENDED ON 04 DEC 2020
Charitable objects
PAYMENT OF PENSIONS TO POOR PERSONS WHO, ON ATTAINING THE AGE OF 60YEARS, OR 45 YEARS WHERE PERSONS ARE INCAPACITATED FROM EARNING THEIR LIVING BY REASON OF SOME PHYSICAL OR MENTAL INFIRMITY, ARE OR WERE IN THE EMPLOYMENT OF E DINGLE AND COMPANY LIMITED. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 8 AND 9 OF SCHEME)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.