Trustees ROTTINGDEAN WHITEWAY CENTRE
Charity number: 264853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William McNaught | Chair | 09 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Virginia Man Chee Fung | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angelina Chan | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Winter | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Swift | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Gregory | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Joy Hoole | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Johnson | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wilson | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stewart HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 08 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
LYNN HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Newman | Trustee | 27 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.