Trustees WANTAGE CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 265227
Charity reporting is up to date (24 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Robin Dunford | Chair | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gabrielle Geddes | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Davis | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denise Davies | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Delia Greaves | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Kender | Trustee | 29 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NOBLE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.