Trustees CENTRE FOR ALTERNATIVE TECHNOLOGY CHARITY LIMITED
Charity number: 265239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eve Jardine-Young | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sian Thomas | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Benjamin Duncan Summers | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rhiannon Rosalind Turner | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin David Gould | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Lober | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sonya Bedford | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
KALYANI RHODES | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Reginald Gross | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Pearman | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Denis Thomas | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.