Trustees ROYAL ARMY DENTAL CORPS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 265463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Major General Ewan Blythe Carmichael CBE | Chair | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Retired Paul George Mannering OStJ | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Marie Grannells | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Boslem | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Retired Katherine Richardson | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Paul Johnston | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Timothy John Davies | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Warrant Officer Zoe Louise Beckett | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.