Governing document RURAL AGE CONCERN DARENT VALLEY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/03/1979 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/1979 AS AMENDED ON 07/09/1981 AS AMENDED ON 23/02/1995 AS AMENDED ON 12/06/1996 AS AMENDED ON 24/07/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE AREA OF RURAL AGE CONCERN DARENT VALLEY AS DEFINED IN CLAUSE 1.
Area of benefit
NORTHERN PARISHES OF SEVENOAKS DISTRICT COUNCIL AND SOUTHERN PARISHES OF DARTFORD BOROUGH COUNCIL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.