Accounts and annual returns MUHAMMADI TRUST OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND
Charity number: 265673
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 06 December 2021 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 06 December 2021 | 129 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 28 September 2021 | 425 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 16 September 2021 | 413 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 23 January 2020 | 177 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | 23 December 2019 | 146 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window