Governing document IGLESIA NI CRISTO (CHURCH OF CHRIST)
Charity number: 265828
Charity reporting is overdue by 260 days
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/05/1973 AS AMENDED ON 10/05/2010 AS AMENDED ON 25/07/2010 AS AMENDED ON 31/01/2012 AS AMENDED ON 22/09/2014
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND PROPAGATION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
ENGLAND, WALES, NORTHERN IRELAND, SCOTLAND AND OTHER AREAS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.