Accounts and annual returns THE CENTRE FOR RELAXATION
Charity number: 266300
Charity reporting is overdue by 1721 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 260 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 260 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 625 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 625 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 990 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 990 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1355 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1355 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1721 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1721 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window