Accounts and annual returns BRISTOL CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 266472
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 January 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 12 January 2015 | 30 December 2015 | 48 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 02 December 2014 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | 02 December 2014 | On time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2013 | 27 March 2014 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2013 | 27 March 2014 | On time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2012 | 12 March 2013 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2012 | 12 March 2013 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window