Trustees HOLLAND HOUSE SCHOOL
Charity number: 267174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Safia Tharoo | Chair | 14 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Raxita Kantaria | Trustee | 26 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Ketan Patel | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Parag Mehta | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
NEEL SHAH | Trustee | 17 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
KRISHNA MAJEETHIA | Trustee | 07 February 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
STEPHEN WILSON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.