Trustees THE SELBORNE SOCIETY LIMITED
Charity number: 267635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Peacock | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debora Worsley | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Goddard | Trustee | 07 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mary Caroline Rutherford | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hadland | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kim Wakeham | Trustee | 07 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Elizabeth Jennifer Goddard | Trustee | 07 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOhn Morrell | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS PETER FERRIDAY | Trustee |
|
||||||
CATHERINE RACHEL HALL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.