Governing document AGE CONCERN SUFFOLK
Charity number: 267850
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16TH MAY 1974 AS AMENDED ON 14TH MARCH 1979, 8TH JANUARY 1991, 4TH OCTOBER 1995 AND 2ND OCTOBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
COUNTY OF SUFFOLK
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.