Trustees UBLEY VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 267911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Smart | Chair | 26 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Helen kingsland | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roxana Leurquin | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christabel Peacock | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Williams | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Rundle | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christian Crawfurd | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CHARTER | Trustee | 12 March 2009 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ARTHUR KNIGHT | Trustee | 12 March 2009 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN BLANCHARD | Trustee | 12 March 2000 |
|
|
||||
The Parish Council of Ubley | Trustee | 15 March 1974 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.