Governing document HOSPITAL RADIO IPSWICH
Charity number: 268114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH MAY 1974 AND AMENDED 20TH OCTOBER 1974, 19TH OCTOBER 1975, 7TH OCTOBER 1979, 10TH OCTOBER 1982 AND 9TH OCTOBER 1994 as amended on 11 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO HELP RELIEVE SICKNESS DISABILITY AND INFIRMITY AMONG PERSONS LIVING IN IPSWICH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD BY PROVIDING A BROADCASTING SERVICE FOR HOSPITALS IN CO-OPERATION AND LIAISON WITH THE RELEVANT HEALTH INSTITUTIONS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
IPSWICH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.