Governing document THE TRURO DIOCESAN GUILD OF RINGERS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS REVISED 2ND MARCH 1974, 1ST MARCH 1975, 6TH MARCH 1976, 6TH MARCH 1983, 7TH MARCH 1987, 3RD MARCH 1990 AND 1 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
TO BE OF SERVICE TO THE CHURCH IN THE DIOCESE OF TRURO BY: (A) RINGING FOR DIVINE SERVICE. (B) RECRUITING AND TRAINING RINGERS. (C) ENCOURAGING THE ART OF CHANGE RINGING. (D) ENCOURAGING THE RINGERS TO TAKE PART IN THE WORSHIPPING LIFE OF THE CHURCH IE CARE AD RESTORATION OF BELLS AND THEIR FITTINGS.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF TRURO
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.