Trustees Warnham PTFA
Charity number: 268571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosalind Owens | Chair | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Synva Midtboe | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Sage | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily James | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marti-Leigh Williams | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jen Smith | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Murray-Loxley | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Woodards | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Coysh | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Mooring | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Prodger | Trustee | 17 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Harris | Trustee | 17 January 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.