Accounts and annual returns BRITISH JOURNAL OF ANAESTHESIA
Charity number: 270484
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 11 September 2008 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 20 September 2007 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 20 September 2007 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 01 September 2006 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 01 September 2006 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 08 August 2005 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 08 August 2005 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window