Trustees HARDINGSTONE VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 270767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL MICHAEL WEATHERLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Stanley Brooks | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Driscoll | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Elaine Johnson | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Beverley Jayne Hollins | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
LES PACE | Trustee | 09 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE BRAMBLEY | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Norman Edwin Pope | Trustee | 30 January 1976 |
|
|||||
MARIANNE MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.