Governing document NATIONAL CO-ORDINATING COMMITTEE ON SWIMMING - PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND MARCH 1974 AS AMENDED 10TH MARCH 1976, 19TH MAY 1976 AND 11TH MARCH 1992, AND MARCH 1999 as amended on 21 Jun 2018 as amended on 21 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE SWIMMING AS A BENEFICIAL ACTIVITY FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES. (B) TO PROVIDE A CONSULTIVE FORUM FOR THE NATIONAL ORGANISATIONS CONCERNED WITH SWIMMING FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, AND CO-ORDINATE, WHERE APPROPRIATE, THE WORK OF MEMBER ORGANISATIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.