Governing document IPSWICH BACH CHOIR
Charity number: 272247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 8TH SEPTEMBER 1976 AND 29TH SEPTEMBER 1976 AND AMENDED 23RD MAY 1979, 21ST MAY 1980, 9TH SEPTEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN CHORAL MUSIC BY THE STUDY AND PERFORMANCE OF CHORAL WORKS OF EXCELLENCE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
IPSWICH
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.