Governing document THE MARKETORS TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 OCTOBER 1976, AS AMENDED 19 JANUARY 206 AND 4 DECEMBER 2008, AND ORDERS OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 30 NOVEMBER 2005 AND 1 DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF ANY PERSON BEING IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES WHO IS OR WHO HAS BEEN A FREEMAN OF THE COMPANY. (B) THE RELIEF OF ANY PERSON BEING IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES WHO IS THE WIDOW ORPHAN OR DEPENDANT OF ANY DECEASED FREEMAN OF THE COMPANY. (C) THE EDUCATION OF ANY CHILD BEING IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES OF A FREEMAN OR DECEASED FREEMAN OF THE COMPANY. FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF TRUST DEED DATED 12TH OCTOBER 1976.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.