Trustees THE LONDON FOREST CHOIR
Charity number: 272799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clare Myers | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Michelle Matthews | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Liz Wade | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Janet Cassford | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Sally Robinson | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Helen Petchey | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
PAUL GILLETT | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Alison Clewlow | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|||||||||
PHILLIPA KINGS | Trustee | 15 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
KAIREN ZONENA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Emily Morrell | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
DAVID JOHN POMFRET | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
JOAN CARDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MS JO FLETCHER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.