Trustees EASTON-ON-THE-HILL VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 272834
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Eileen Briers | Chair | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gavin King | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Kindness | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Green | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Lerse | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Glenis Woodman | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elizabeth Sampy | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catriona Stewart Goodwin | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Frost | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hamish Crick | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Auchterlonie | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anna Cheatley | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
HELEN TOMBLIN | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.