Trustees FIRST LIPHOOK SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 273205
Charity reporting is up to date (182 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Edward Clark | Chair | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Hains | Trustee | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah-Jane Anslow | Trustee | 19 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Meekins | Trustee | 16 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Jackson | Trustee | 12 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
ALISON MARY JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.