Accounts and annual returns HOOKE PARK EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Charity number: 273760
Charity reporting is overdue by 1504 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 43 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 43 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 409 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 409 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 774 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 774 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1139 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1139 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1504 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1504 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window