Trustees THE HENRY TYNDALE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 274092
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carly Hooper | Chair | 25 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
martin carty | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Manders | Trustee | 21 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Oakley | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jen Pritchard | Trustee | 10 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Becca Howard | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
SALLY JOHNSON | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
AYSHA ARIF | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
KERRY NASH | Trustee | 18 March 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.