Governing document SOUTHEND BACH CHOIR
Charity number: 274370
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JUL 1977 AS AMENDED ON 26 SEP 2004 AS AMENDED ON 21 FEB 2006 AS AMENDED ON 30 SEP 2014 AS AMENDED ON 30 SEP 2014 AS AMENDED ON 11 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES, IN PARTICULAR OF MUSIC, AND THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE SOUTHEND.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.