Governing document INTERNATIONAL GLAUCOMA ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/01/1977 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/12/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/06/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/02/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/02/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/02/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/03/2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 08/03/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/04/2015
Charitable objects
1. TO PRESERVE SIGHT BY THE EDUCATION OF PATIENTS, THE PUBLIC, MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS AND ALLIED PROFESSIONS IN THE PROBLEMS OF GLAUCOMA AND ALLIED CONDITIONS ESPECIALLY (BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THOSE PROBLEMS INVOLVED IN THEIR EARLY RECOGNITION AND THE MAINTENANCE OF A HIGH STANDARD OF TREATMENT. 2. TO ADVANCE OR FACILITATE RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, TREATMENT AND ALLEVIATION OF GLAUCOMA AND ALLIED CONDITIONS AND TO ENSURE THE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH TO THE PROFESSIONS AND THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.