Governing document HOSPITAL RADIO TUNBRIDGE WELLS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH NOVEMBER 1977. AMENDED 20 JAN 1995 AND 1 OCTOBER 1999 AND 18 MAY 2008 AS AMENDED ON 16 MAY 2018
Charitable objects
1. THE AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF THE ORGANISATION SHALL BE TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, INFIRMITY AND OLD AGE AMONG PERSONS IN TUNBRIDGE WELLS, TONBRIDGE, PEMBURY, SEVENOAKS AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING A BROADCASTING SERVICE, WITH REGULAR PROGRAMMES OF LOCAL INTEREST, TO HOSPITALS, HOSPICES, OLD PERSONS HOMES AND TO OTHER HEALTHCARE INSTITUTIONS IN THOSE AREAS, TO PROVIDE A SIMILAR SERVICE WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY TO ASSIST PATIENTS RECEIVING "CARE IN THE COMMUNITY" AND PATIENTS RECOVERING IN THE COMMUNITY FOLLOWING A STAY IN A HEALTHCARE INSTITUTION. 2. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTIVES THE CHARITY SHALL: I. PROVIDE PROGRAMMES OF INTEREST AND RELEVANCE TO THOSE WHO ARE PATIENTS, SICK, INFIRM OR AGED II. MAKE THESE PROGRAMMES AVAILABLE TO SIMILAR ESTABLISHMENTS AND/OR ORGANISATIONS, IF APPROPRIATE III. PROVIDE A "MESSENGER SERVICE" AND CO-OPERATE WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING A SIMILAR SERVICE LOCALLY, NATIONALLY AND/OR INTERNATIONALLY
Area of benefit
TUNBRIDGE WELLS, TONBRIDGE, PEMBURY AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.