Trustees THE SUFFOLK REGIMENT MUSEUM AND TRUST FUND
Charity number: 275468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lieutenant Colonel Mark Hubert Wenham | Chair | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Major Gregory Owen Luton | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Mark Clint Shropshire | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Major Oliver James Daniel Bullen | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Knight MBE DL | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Lt Col David Sean Denson | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Cllr Robert Dale Everitt | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
LT COL ANTHONY DOUGLAS SLATER | Trustee | 10 June 2008 |
|
|||||
BRIGADIER ANTHONY JOHN KENNION CALDER OBE DL | Trustee | 12 August 2005 |
|
|
||||
COL COLIN MAXWELL ELSDEN DL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.