Governing document HAVERGAL BRIAN SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 27 JAN 1978 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25 JAN 1980 AS AMENDED ON 25 FEB 1995 AS AMENDED ON 17 MAY 2008 AS AMENDED ON 28 FEB 2015 AS AMENDED ON 30 MAY 2015 AS AMENDED ON 30 MAY 2020 AS AMENDED ON 15 AUG 2020 AS AMENDED ON 22 MAY 2021 AS AMENDED ON 05 FEB 2022 as amended on 11 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY ARE TO PROMOTE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF THE LIFE AND WORKS OF WILLIAM HAVERGAL BRIAN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.