Trustees OXFORDSHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
Charity number: 275891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM DAVID AUSTEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Wendy Lancaster | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Ramon | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Charles Henry Eldridge | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Christine Trueman | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Poile | Trustee | 07 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mattheus | Trustee | 07 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CRAMER | Trustee | 23 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUE HONORE | Trustee | 26 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.