Trustees NORTHAMPTON BACH CHOIR
Charity number: 276390
Charity reporting is overdue by 73 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan James Alms | Chair | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Leathley | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Gill | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leah Perry | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elianne Rachel Montero | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iain Charles Erskine | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lady Judith Ann ELLWOOD | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BRIAN GEORGE TRISTRAM | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|||||
SHEILA ANN MOAKES | Trustee | 26 September 2005 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.