Accounts and annual returns KINGSBROMPTON YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB
Charity number: 276491
Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 September 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 33 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 September 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 33 days | |
Annual return | 12 September 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 September 2021 | 21 December 2022 | 162 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 September 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 September 2019 | 17 September 2020 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 September 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window