Trustees GALHAMPTON VILLAGE HALL & PLAYING FIELD
Charity number: 277622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Geoffrey Trasler | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Alan Rickers | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|||||
TESSA RUTH CARTER | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Jane Williams | Trustee | 19 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Paul John Carter | Trustee | 18 May 2015 |
|
|||||
FIONA HOOPER | Trustee | 13 January 2013 |
|
|||||
MARION JUDITH FOX OR CHARLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW PETER MARSDEN | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.