Governing document ST MARGARET'S SOMERSET HOSPICE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 07/01/1980 AND AMENDED ON 23/01/1980, 12/11/1996, 08/092000, 13/05/2003, AND 11/05/2004 NOW ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 30/11/2009 as amended on 30 Dec 2017 as amended on 20 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE ASSOCIATION SHALL THINK FIT. (FOR DETAILS SEE ARTICLE 7 OF THE ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.