Trustees GEORGE ADAMSON WILDLIFE PRESERVATION TRUST
Charity number: 279598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jake Michael Alfred Thomson | Chair | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mervyn Chaplin | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Peacock | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sam Neckar | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kaytie Grant | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Cohn | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Astrid Anne Sylvia Harbord | Trustee | 30 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN JACKMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL CHAUVEAU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR BOB MARSHALL-ANDREWS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY MARRIAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.