Trustees ST MICHAEL'S SCHOOL (LEIGH-ON-SEA) LIMITED
Charity number: 280688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK HARWOOD STENNETT | Chair | 01 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Sawyer | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Parnell | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Elizabeth Tetchner | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Fraser MacCleod | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Suzanna Minnis | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Victoria Shaw | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Holdcroft | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Wylie | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
S MILLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FAY EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.