Governing document HETHERSETT JUBILEE YOUTH CENTRE
Charity number: 281172
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH SEPTEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED 17TH JUNE 1985, 17TH NOVEMBER 1993, 25 MARCH 2003, 20 OCTOBER 2004 AND 9 MARCH 2010 as amended on 15 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
To help young people, especially but not exclusively through leisure time activities, so as to develop their capabilities that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
HETHERSETT CP,GT MELTON CP,LITTLE MELTON CP,KETTERINGHAM CP.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.