Trustees THE GOODWIN HALL CHARITY
Charity number: 283482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William James Landymore | Trustee | 18 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Raymond Mead | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WEBSTER | Trustee | 14 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GOODWIN BSC | Trustee | 16 October 2008 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN STANNARD | Trustee | 01 March 1995 |
|
|
||||
Roy Goodwin | Trustee | 01 January 1980 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE WILLIAM FROST | Trustee | 25 November 1977 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.